FLEET BAPTIST PRE-SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Pre-school education, in a Christian environment, of Children aged 2 years to compulsory school age regardless their, or their families, religious persuasion, racial origin, cultural and linguistic background,
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £62,486 from 1 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Hampshire
Governance
- 18 February 2004: Standard registration
- FLEET BAPTIST PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARK BLACKWELL | Chair | 20 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
Jeff Fisher | Trustee | 17 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Heather Jean Bailey | Trustee | 17 November 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £66.48k | £66.30k | £61.89k | £75.08k | £88.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £79.07k | £72.72k | £68.70k | £71.91k | £82.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £52.25k | £57.89k | £44.21k | £48.16k | £62.49k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 07 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 07 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 22 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 22 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 15 July 2021 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 15 July 2021 | 15 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 25 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 25 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION DATED 25 NOVEMBER 2003 AS AMENDED 23 JULY 2005 AND 14 MAY 2007.
Charitable objects
1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING SPIRITUAL DEVELOPMENT) OF CHILDREN BELOW COMPULSORY SCHOOL AGE; 2. THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION FOR SUCH CHILDREN IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; BY PROVIDING FOR ANY CHILDREN WITHOUT DISCRIMINATION BY REASON OF A CHILD'S RELIGIOUS PERSUASION, RACIAL ORIGIN, CULTURAL AND LINGUISTIC BACKGROUND A SAFE AND SATISFYING PLAYGROUP IN A CHRISTIAN ENVIRONMENT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED, IN PRACTICE FLEET, HAMPSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
FLEET BAPTIST CHURCH
115 CLARENCE ROAD
FLEET
GU51 3RS
- Phone:
- 07976 634109
- Email:
- admin@fbpreschool.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window