NORTHUMBERLAND COUNTY BLIND ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charitys objective and its principal activity are to support people with a visual impairment in the County of Northumberland to enable increased independence and to help them fulfil their potential.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £51,200 from 2 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
150 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Northumberland
Governance
- 27 February 2004: Standard registration
- 10 April 2019: Funds received from 1092103 THE BLYTH AND DISTRICT TALKING NEWSPAPER
- NCBA (Working name)
- Vision Northumberland (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Mary Taylor | Chair | 18 March 2021 |
|
|||||||
Richard D'Alton | Trustee | 16 September 2024 |
|
|||||||
Jennifer D'Alton | Trustee | 16 September 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Julie Leddy | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Geoff Bushell | Trustee | 20 March 2023 |
|
|||||||
Jack Moffat | Trustee | 16 November 2022 |
|
|||||||
Alistair Robert Wade | Trustee | 14 September 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Mala Janes | Trustee | 25 January 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £84.76k | £229.01k | £165.06k | £319.86k | £406.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £137.08k | £169.83k | £186.52k | £261.75k | £324.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £25.50k | £10.00k | £30.00k | £51.20k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 05 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 16 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 30/05/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27/06/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05/11/2012 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 16/01/2013 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 05/11/2012
Charitable objects
1.1 TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF (AND WORK WITH OR FOR) THE VISUALLY AND SENSORILY IMPAIRED INHABITANTS OF NORTHUMBERLAND AND ITS SURROUNDING AREAS BY PROVIDING GOODS, SERVICES AND FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND INDEPENDENCE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE STANDARD AND QUALITY OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS; TO ESTABLISH AND BUILD, AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE, ONE OR MORE RESOURCE CENTRES FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CHARITY AND ITS CONSTITUENT BODIES IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTIVES
Area of benefit
NORTHUMBERLAND
Contact information
- Address:
-
REIVER HOUSE
STAITHES LANE
MORPETH
NORTHUMBERLAND
NE61 1TD
- Phone:
- 01670514316
- Email:
- ruth.speirs@ncba.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window