Financial history ROCHESTER CATHEDRAL OLD CHORISTERS' ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1103867
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £13.72k £1.06k £6.29k £915 £1.53k
Total expenditure £1.33k £248 £5.85k £295 £1.89k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A