Financial history DONYATT RECREATIONAL AREA

Charity Number: 1101655
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023
Total gross income £2.23k £2.75k £2.27k £5.98k £2.15k
Total expenditure £2.36k £868 £781 £1.93k £7.92k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A