NIGHTLINE ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Nightline Association is the umbrella body for Nightlines in the UK. Nightlines are confidential, anonymous, non-judgmental, non-directive, and non-advisory listening services run by students for students. We support, promote, and develop Nightlines by providing guidance on best practice, carrying out quality assurance, maintaining a wide range of IT services and tools, and organising events
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
64 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 29 November 2021: CIO registration
- NIGHTLINE (Working name)
- NNL (Working name)
- NATIONAL NIGHTLINE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Michael Sanders | Chair | 08 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paola Luciana Igarteburu | Trustee | 26 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Peter Sequeira | Trustee | 27 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Helen Bedser | Trustee | 27 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Josh Fogg | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Barnes | Trustee | 04 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Cassandra Kamara | Trustee | 31 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Veronika Dvorakova | Trustee | 31 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Megan Haskins | Trustee | 31 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Martin Smith | Trustee | 21 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Axbey | Trustee | 02 May 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £113.82k | £75.98k | £73.33k | £60.63k | £87.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £38.96k | £79.98k | £59.81k | £61.61k | £86.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 07 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 07 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 17 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 03 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 13 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 26/04/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02/12/2005 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 10/03/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 19/05/2015 AS AMENDED ON 12 DEC 2020 AS AMENDED ON 21 MAY 2021 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10 APR 2021 as amended on 09 Apr 2022 as amended on 06 Jul 2024
Charitable objects
3. OBJECTS 3.1 THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE: 3.1.1 THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH AMONG STUDENTS EXPERIENCING OR AT RISK OF, DEPRESSION, SUICIDE, DESPAIR OR DISTRESS, OR ANY OTHER FORM OF MENTAL ILLNESS AT ANY INSTITUTION OF HIGHER OR FURTHER EDUCATION IN THE UK AND EQUIVALENT INSTITUTIONS OUTSIDE THE UK BY FACILITATING, SUPPORTING AND IMPROVING THE PROVISION OF LISTENING AND OTHER SERVICES TO SUPPORT THOSE IN NEED; AND 3.1.2 TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN PARTICULAR BY PROMOTING PUBLIC UNDERSTANDING AND AWARENESS OF MENTAL ILLNESS AMONG STUDENTS. 3.2 NOTHING IN THE ARTICLES SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CHARITY FOR PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005 AND/OR SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008.
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Linked charities
- 29 November 2021 : CIO registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
Lytchett House
13 Freeland Park
Wareham Road
Poole
Dorset
BH16 6FA
- Phone:
- 07396712219
- Email:
- enquiries@nightline.ac.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window