LATHBURY INSTITUTE OR HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supporting the religious and other charitable work of the Church of England in the Ecclesiastical Parish of St John the Evangelist, Bury St Edmunds
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Suffolk
Governance
- 26 January 2004: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SALLY PETTITT | Trustee | 06 April 2016 |
|
|
||||||||
JANE HOWLETT | Trustee | 30 April 2014 |
|
|
||||||||
MARY McGUIRE | Trustee | 30 April 2014 |
|
|
||||||||
REV JULIA CORINNE MANN | Trustee | 23 October 2012 |
|
|||||||||
JANET ANNE HAYWARD | Trustee | 06 November 2011 |
|
|
||||||||
Hugh Graham Belsey | Trustee |
|
||||||||||
SARA HARPER | Trustee |
|
||||||||||
ADRIAN DAVID MANN | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £551 | £313 | £40 | £1.13k | £4.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £2.00k | £4.00k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 16 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF GIFT DATED 10 JUNE 1896, AS AMENDED BY SCHEME OF THE CHARITY COMMISSION 8 NOVEMBER 1968 AND 5 SEPTEMBER 1980
Charitable objects
SUBJECT TO PAYMENT OF THE EXPENSES AFORESAID THE MANAGING TRUSTEES SHALL APPLY THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY IN FURTHERING THE RELIGIOUS AND OTHER CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JOHN THE EVANGELIST BURY ST EDMUNDSS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
13 ORCHARD STREET
BURY ST. EDMUNDS
IP33 1EH
- Phone:
- 01284753984
- Email:
- adrian.mann@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window