THE BENNETT FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
general charitable gifts to the sick or needy
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2017
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Israel
Governance
- 23 April 2004: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID LAURENCE BENNETT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2013 | 05/04/2014 | 05/04/2015 | 05/04/2016 | 05/04/2017 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 104 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 104 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 470 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 470 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 835 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 835 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1200 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1200 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1565 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1565 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 2 DECEMBER 2003 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 26 MARCH 2004.
Charitable objects
(I) THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS BY THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO FURTHER THE CHARITABLE WORKS OF : (A) CHARITABLE ORGANISATIONS UNDERTAKING RESEARCH INTO CANCER. (B) ORGANISATIONS PROVIDING CARE FOR SUFFERS OF CANCER AND THEIR FAMILIES. (C) THE RED STAR AMBULANCE SERVICE IN ISRAEL. (II) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION BY THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO FURTHER THE CHARITABLE WORKS OF THE TECHNION IN HAIFA AND THE HEBREW UNIVERSITY IN JERUSALEM, ISRAEL. (III) THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY, OF PEOPLE LIVING IN THE UK OR ISRAEL BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY FOR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES, THE RELIEF OF THE SICK-POOR, LIVING IN THE UK OR ISRAEL EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF GRANTS, GOODS OR SERVICES. (IV) SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE DONATIONS TO ORGANISATIONS WHICH ARE CHARITABLE IN NATURE AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION SEE FIT.
Area of benefit
UK AND ISRAEL
Contact information
- Address:
-
248 ALLERTON ROAD
MOSSLEY HILL
LIVERPOOL
L18 6JP
- Phone:
- 01517242930
- Email:
- db613uk@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window