St Just Parish Trust

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To preserve, maintain, improve and beautify the Parish Church of St. Just-in-Penwith, Cornwall and its contents including glass, monuments, bells and ornaments, the Churchyard, Burial Grounds and Paths To preserve, maintain and enhance the Church Rooms (the hall and social accommodation).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Cornwall
Governance
- 07 April 2004: Standard registration
- ST JUST CHURCH FRIENDS AND CHURCH ROOMS TRUST (Previous name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alison Grose | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW MICHAEL BURT | Trustee | 23 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Mercia Hocking | Trustee | 26 April 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.78k | £16.42k | £14.96k | £47.38k | £23.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.29k | £75.19k | £4.97k | £20.60k | £38.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 01 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 01 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 25 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 23 NOVEMBER 2003 as amended on 28 Oct 2017
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION. TO PRESERVE , MAINTAIN, IMPROVE AND BEAUTIFY THE PARISH OF ST JUST-IN-PENWITH IN THE COUNTY OF CORNWALL AND ITS CONTENTS INCLUDING GLASS, MONUMENTS, BELLS AND ORNAMENTS. THE PRESERVATION, MAINTENANCE AND ENHANCEMENT OF THE CHURCHYARDS AND BURIAL GROUND, THEIR WALLS, GATES, MONUMENTS AND PATHS. THE PRESERVATION OF THE VICARAGE, ITS GROUNDS AND OUTBUILDINGS AND THEIR ENHANCEMENT. THE PRESERVATION OF THE FREEHOLD OF THE CHURCH AND PARSONAGE OF ST JUST-IN-PENWITH IN THE COUNTY OF CORNWALL. THE PRESERVATION, MAINTENANCE AND ENHANCEMENT OF THE CHURCH ROOMS.
Area of benefit
ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JUST-IN-PENWITH, CORNWALL
Contact information
- Address:
-
'An Govva'
23 Bosorne Street
St. Just
Cornwall
- Phone:
- 07768893076
- Email:
- stjustparishtrust@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window