Financial history THE CENTRE OF THE CELL

Charity number: 1102034
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2009 31/07/2010 31/07/2011 31/07/2012 31/07/2013
Total gross income £421.41k £484.15k £305.53k £425.08k £460.25k
Total expenditure £239.25k £320.33k £451.37k £525.66k £403.25k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A