Accounts and annual returns RMS COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity number: 1103301
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 04 April 2015 15 May 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2015 Not Required
Annual return 04 April 2014 15 May 2015 100 days late
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2014 Not Required
Annual return 04 April 2013 13 May 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2013 Not Required
Annual return 04 April 2012 01 February 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2012 Not Required