RMS COMMUNITY TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supports the community activities of Robert May's School, Odiham
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 04 April 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Hampshire
Governance
- 20 April 2004: Standard registration
- 02 June 2015: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- 02 June 2015: Funds transferred to 800466 THE ROBERT MAY'S CHARITABLE TRUST
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 04/04/2011 | 04/04/2012 | 04/04/2013 | 04/04/2014 | 04/04/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £311 | £111 | £35 | £46 | £1 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 04 April 2015 | 15 May 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 04 April 2014 | 15 May 2015 | 100 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 04 April 2013 | 13 May 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 04 April 2012 | 01 February 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2012 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 12 DECEMBER 2003 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 24 MARCH 2004
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN PARTICULAR BY SUPPORTING ROBERT MAY'S SCHOOL IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION PROGRAMMES INCLUDING INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY AND THE USE OF COMPUTERS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window