OCD-UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
OCD-UK AIMS TO IMPROVE AWARENESS OF THE CONDITION BOTH AMONGST THE GENERAL PUBLIC AND WITHIN THE MEDICAL COMMUNITY, WITH THE LONG TERM AIM OF CAMPAIGNING TO ENSURE THAT EVERY SUFFERER RECEIVES THE QUALITY OF TREATMENT THEY DESERVE. WE ALSO FACILITATE A SAFE ENVIRONMENT FOR PEOPLE AFFECTED BY OCD TO COMMUNICATE WITH EACH OTHER AND PROVIDE MUTUAL UNDERSTANDING AND SUPPORT.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
9 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 14 April 2004: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CATHERINE MILLS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Claire Goldenberg | Trustee | 06 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Nisbet | Trustee | 06 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
KYLIE CLOKE | Trustee | 02 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Nick Marlow | Trustee | 01 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Rowe | Trustee | 01 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Griffiths | Trustee | 02 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
CLAIRE GELLARD | Trustee | 16 May 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £137.48k | £226.29k | £229.66k | £138.63k | £161.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £113.34k | £160.99k | £169.01k | £163.87k | £164.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 22 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 22 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 07/01/2004 AS AMENDED ON 20/03/2004 AS AMENDED ON 10/11/2012 AS AMENDED ON 02/11/2013
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS (THE OBJECTS) ARE: TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND IMPROVE AWARENESS OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC AND ORGANISATIONS ABOUT OBSESSIVE-COMPULSIVE DISORDER (OCD. TO RELIEVE PERSONS AFFECTED BY OBSESSIVE-COMPULSIVE DISORDER (OCD) BY THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION, ADVICE AND SUPPORT TO ENABLE THEM TO ACCESS THE MOST APPROPRIATE QUALITY, CARE, SUPPORT AND TREATMENT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 Chapel Street
Belper
Derbyshire
DE56 1AR
- Phone:
- 03332120703
- Email:
- office@ocduk.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window