Financial history Shepherd Group Brass Band

Charity number: 1101867
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £73.66k £85.98k £48.61k £63.68k £104.22k
Total expenditure £56.26k £54.10k £13.75k £58.50k £87.40k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A