Shepherd Group Brass Band

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To be of pleasure and assistance to the local and wider community. To encourage, teach and develop people both musically and socially, free of charge. To provide an inclusive and welcoming social environment that is open to all, irrespective of gender, sexuality, financial circumstances, background, ethnicity, disabilities or religion.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Durham
- Manchester City
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 02 February 2004: Standard registration
- THE SHEPHERD BUILDING GROUP (Working name)
- THE NESTLE ROWNTREE BAND (Previous name)
- THE SHEPHERD BUILDING GROUP BRASS BAND (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alister Talbot | Chair | 10 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Craig Brown | Trustee | 10 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
MRS J A BROWN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID GREGG | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
THOMAS AYLETT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £73.66k | £85.98k | £48.61k | £63.68k | £104.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £56.26k | £54.10k | £13.75k | £58.50k | £87.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 27 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2022
(These accounts |
30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 02 December 2021 | 32 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 02 December 2021 | 32 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 March 2021 | 139 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 19 March 2021 | 139 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12 DECEMBER 2003 AS AMENDED ON 10 FEBRUARY 2004 as amended on 22 Feb 2022
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ART OF MUSIC MAKING AND IN PARTICULAR THE ART AND SCIENCE OF BRASS BAND MUSIC AND THE FURTHER DEVELOPMENT OF THE PUBLIC'S APPRECIATION OF THE SAID ART BY THE PRESENTATION OF CONCERTS, MUSIC FESTIVALS AND SIMILAR ACTIVITIES AND TO ENCOURAGE THE MUSICAL EDUCATION OF YOUNG PLAYERS BY THE PROVISION OF TUITION AND TRAINING FACILITIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE YORK
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 Hollis Crescent
Strensall
YORK
YO32 5SP
- Phone:
- 07941791977
- Email:
- alistertalbot@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window