Accounts and annual returns WESTERTON PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENTS TEACHERS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1101613
Charity reporting is overdue by 1064 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 333 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 333 days
Annual return 31 August 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 699 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 699 days
Annual return 31 August 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1064 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1064 days
Annual return 31 August 2020 01 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 01 February 2021 216 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required