WESTERTON PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENTS TEACHERS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fundraising to offer additional teaching resources for teachers at Westerton School
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2020
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Leeds City
Governance
- 19 January 2004: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sindy Michelle Allen | Chair | 10 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Allen | Trustee | 10 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
STEPHANIE MAKIN PRESIDENT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2016 | 31/08/2017 | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.53k | £7.44k | £7.41k | £10.84k | £5.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.15k | £14.52k | £14.37k | £1.14k | £10.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 306 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 306 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 672 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 672 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1037 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1037 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 01 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 01 February 2021 | 216 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 4 NOVEMBER 2003
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY: (1) DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; (2) ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS
Area of benefit
THE CATCHMENT AREA OF WESTERTON PRIMARY SCHOOL, WAKEFIELD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Westerton Primary Academy
Hesketh Lane
Tingley
WAKEFIELD
WF3 1AR
- Phone:
- 01132533504
- Email:
- office@westerton.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window