Financial history THE SUDBURY GROUP OF THE THIRD AGE TRUST

Charity number: 1101615
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £27.87k £17.05k £12.56k £32.16k £39.37k
Total expenditure £29.02k £17.33k £14.41k £29.05k £38.33k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A