Trustees THE SUDBURY GROUP OF THE THIRD AGE TRUST
Charity number: 1101615

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ian George Mathews | Chair | 13 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robert Ogles | Trustee | 25 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Ogles | Trustee | 25 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Andrew John Catton-Taylor | Trustee | 25 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Elizabeth Tanswell | Trustee | 25 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Michael James Fitzmaurice | Trustee | 25 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Keith Alan Hughes | Trustee | 25 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Lyn Gray | Trustee | 27 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dorothy Beal | Trustee | 22 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard Bruce Clegg | Trustee | 23 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
COLETTE BENTLEY | Trustee | 06 March 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.