THE EASINGWOLD TOWN BAND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The band holds weekly practices in its own refurbished band room in Easingwold. Instruments are available for loan to members and tuition is given to new members. The band plays in the town and surrounding villages at summer season events such as galas, open-air concerts and ecumenical services. It also plays for various carol concerts and services during the Christmas season.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- City Of York
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 30 January 2004: Standard registration
- 19 April 2024: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 19 April 2024: Funds transferred to 1194820 EASINGWOLD TOWN BAND CIO
- EASINGWOLD BRASS (Working name)
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.42k | £19.42k | £25.86k | £12.84k | £7.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.86k | £10.13k | £7.32k | £19.32k | £6.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £2.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £17.43k | £6.29k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 05 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 28 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 28 April 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 28 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 18 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19 MAY 2003, AS AMENDED 16 OCTOBER 2006. NULL AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 17 OCT 2022
Charitable objects
I) TO PROMOTE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN THE APPRECIATION OF THE ART AND SCIENCE OF BRASS BAND MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS TO PEOPLE OF ALL AGES BY THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS AND RECITALS AND BY SUCH OTHER WAYS AS SHALL BE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE AS THE CHARITY, THROUGH ITS EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE, SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE; II) TO ENCOURAGE YOUNG PEOPLE IN PARTICULAR TO LEARN, APPRECIATE AND PARTICIPATE IN BRASS BAND MUSIC; III) TO PURSUE OBJECTS I) AND II) IN A MANNER CONSISTENT WITH ITS CHILD PROTECTION POLICY AND CODE OF CONDUCT AND WITH THE GENERAL DATA PROTECTION REGULATIONS, AS ADOPTED BY ITS EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE FROM TIME TO TIME.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window