MARY LUIS CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Mary Luis Charitable Trust has been set up to provide grants to individuals or groups to enable them to have life learning and enhancing experiences.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 16 August 2004: Standard registration
- 23 April 2015: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2011 | 05/04/2012 | 05/04/2013 | 05/04/2014 | 05/04/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11 | £8 | £3 | £5 | £2 | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.09k | £0 | £356 | £1.43k | £5.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2015 | 20 April 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2014 | 23 June 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2013 | 23 June 2014 | 138 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2012 | 11 April 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2012 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 5 APRIL 2004
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL APPLY THE INCOME AND SUCH PARTS OF THE CAPITAL OF THE CHARITY AS THEY THINK FIT (WHETHER THROUGH DONATIONS TO OTHER CHARITIES OR BY ANY OTHER CHARITABLE MEANS) FOR OR TOWARDS SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL THINK FIT ("THE OBJECTS")
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window