THE ROTARY CLUB OF WEYMOUTH TRUST FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity operates as part of Weymouth Rotary Club to give grants to local & overseas causes. Often given to help organisations supporting young people but it is not prescriptive and individuals and other local groups can be helped.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Dorset
Governance
- 20 January 2004: Standard registration
No other names
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rose Ann Bruce | Trustee | 01 July 2020 |
|
|||||
Jeremy Richard Way | Trustee | 01 July 2020 |
|
|||||
Neil Price | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|||||
David Smith | Trustee | 01 July 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.93k | £9.39k | £6.25k | £24.85k | £16.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.18k | £10.65k | £5.15k | £24.75k | £14.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 14 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 13 March 2025 | 317 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 13 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 18 November 2022 | 202 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 17 March 2022 | 321 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 2 JANUARY 2004
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF THE POOR AND NEEDY OR SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE CLUB SHALL IN DULY CONSTITUTED MEETING FROM TIME TO TIME DIRECT
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
658 DORCHESTER ROAD
WEYMOUTH
DT3 5LE
- Phone:
- 07703534208
- Email:
- nkprice@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window