HOSTAGE UK
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Hostage UK has three broad aims: - To provide help and support to the families of hostages during a kidnap, and to the families and hostage after release; - To provide educational services to organisations who send employees and contractors to kidnap hotspots to ensure they understand the human risks associated with kidnapping; and - Research and advocacy to improve public understanding
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 30 January 2004: Standard registration
- 03 September 2015: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 03 September 2015: Funds transferred to 1161072 HOSTAGE INTERNATIONAL
- HOSTAGEUK.COM (Working name)
- HOSTAGEUK.ORG (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.90k | £18.24k | £11.00k | £14.96k | £29.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.16k | £26.79k | £18.60k | £14.20k | £32.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 09 December 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | 09 December 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 18 December 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 10 December 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23 DECEMBER 2003
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING AND DISTRESS OF VICTIMS OF HOSTAGE TAKING (WHICH EXPRESSION SHALL INCLUDE KIDNAPPING AND ABDUCTION), AND SUCH PERSON'S RELATIVES AND OTHERS HAVING A CLOSE RELATIONSHIP WITH THE VICTIM, TO PROVIDE THEM WITH ADVICE, AND TO ADVANCE PUBLIC KNOWLEDGE AND AWARENESS OF THE PHENOMENA OF HOSTAGE TAKING AND RELATED ISSUES. THE FOREGOING SHALL INCLUDE, BUT NOT BE LIMITED TO, THE FOLLOWING: (1)THE RELIEF OF BRITISH NATIONALS OR BRITISH RESIDENTS OR OTHER PERSONS WITH STRONG TIES TO THE UNITED KINGDOM WHO ARE VICTIMS OF HOSTAGE TAKING INCLUDING ANY PERSON TAKEN AS A HOSTAGE OR OTHERWISE AND SUCH PERSON'S RELATIVES AND OTHERS HAVING A CLOSE RELATIONSHIP WITH THE VICTIM, SUCH RELIEF TO INCLUDE PROVIDING COUNSELLING AND EMOTIONAL SUPPORT, ADVICE AND INFORMATION ABOUT THE PLACE OF THE HOSTAGE TAKING AND ABOUT POTENTIAL MOTIVES OF HOSTAGE TAKERS (2) THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO ARE VICTIMS OF HOSTAGE TAKING BY THE PROVISION IN APPROPRIATE CIRCUMSTANCES OF FINANCIAL HELP, SUCH AS THE MAKING OF GRANTS, LOANS, AND DONATIONS (3) THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO ARE VICTIMS OF HOSTAGE TAKING BY PROVIDING ADVICE AS TO THE MOST APPROPRIATE BODY TO HELP SUCH VICTIMS WITH THE DISTRESS AND EMOTIONAL TURMOIL THAT ACCOMPANIES SUCH AN EXPERIENCE (4) THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO ARE VICTIMS OF HOSTAGE TAKING BY PROVIDING ADVICE ON DEALING WITH GOVERNMENTS AND GOVERNMENT AGENCIES, NON-GOVERNMENTAL ORGANISATIONS AND THE MEDIA (5) TO PROMOTE, ORGANISE AND TAKE PART IN, NATIONAL, REGIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL DISCUSSIONS, SEMINARS AND CONFERENCES CONCERNING HOSTAGE TAKING AND ITS EFFECT ON VICTIMS AND TO MAKE APPROPRIATE REPRESENTATIONS TO GOVERNMENTS, GOVERNMENT AGENCIES, STATUTORY BODIES, AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS (6) TO ADVANCE THE PUBLIC UNDERSTANDING OF THE PHYSICAL AND EMOTIONAL STRESS THAT VICTIMS OF HOSTAGE TAKING UNDERGO BY PROMOTING APPROPRIATE RESEARCH, INCLUDING GATHERING AND DISSEMINATING INFORMATION ON HOSTAGE TAKING, SO THAT THE MAGNITUDE OF THE PROBLEM AND THE MEANS OF ADDRESSING THE PHENOMENON ARE BETTER UNDERSTOOD WITH THE OBJECT OF PROMOTING THE WILL AND GOOD JUDGEMENT ON THE PART OF INDIVIDUALS AND PUBLIC BODIES TO ADDRESS ITS CAUSES AND TO PROVIDE REMEDIES FOR ITS VICTIMS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window