MEDWAY NEIGHBOURHOOD WATCH ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Coordination and advice to 420 NW schemes in Medway Towns
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Medway
Governance
- 10 May 2004: Standard registration
- 24 April 2024: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 24 April 2024: Funds transferred to 1176617 THE MEDWAY STREET ANGELS
- 24 April 2024: Funds transferred to 1133023 Age UK Kent Rivers
- 24 April 2024: Funds transferred to 1166505 HELP IN THE COMMUNITY
- 24 April 2024: Funds transferred to 284894 Wisdom Hospice Charity
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2018 | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.71k | £1.21k | £525 | £27 | £113 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.69k | £1.89k | £1.17k | £219 | £62 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 17 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 17 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 14 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 28 JUNE 2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 23 FEBRUARY 2004 AND 14 APRIL 2004.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE GOOD CITIZENSHIP AND GREATER PUBLIC PARTICIPATION IN THE PREVENTION AND SOLUTION OF CRIME IN MEDWAY SO THAT EFFECTIVE LIAISON BETWEEN THE POLICE AND PUBLIC CAN BE ACHIEVED.
Area of benefit
MEDWAY
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window