UNITY IN THE COMMUNITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education of young people are socially excluded or at risk of exclusion so that they are better able to integrate into society, develop their employment opportunities, and realise their full potential within their community and within society as a whole. To provide recreational and leisure activities and facilities for the young people of Old Trafford and districts.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 May 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Manchester City
- Trafford
Governance
- 18 March 2004: Standard registration
- 19 October 2023: Funds received from 1108944 OSWESTRY MUSICAL THEATRE COMPANY
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jason Kyriakides | Trustee | 23 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Tuan Thong Huynh | Trustee | 23 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
HOWARD SWARRAY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/05/2020 | 01/05/2021 | 01/05/2022 | 01/05/2023 | 01/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.32k | £0 | £250 | £175 | £500 | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.32k | £0 | £250 | £175 | £500 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 May 2024 | 04 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 May 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 May 2023 | 08 April 2024 | 38 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 May 2022 | 22 March 2023 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 May 2021 | 26 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 May 2020 | 26 August 2021 | 178 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 MAY 2003 AS AMENDED 20 FEBRUARY 2004
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE AGED 7 TO 25 WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED OR AT RISK OF EXCLUSION SO THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY, DEVELOP THEIR EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES AND TO REALISE THEIR FULL POTENTIAL WITHIN THEIR COMMUNITY AND SOCIETY AS A WHOLE. 2. TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE ACTIVITIES FOR THE INHABITANTS OF OLD TRAFFORD AND THE SURROUNDING AREA WHO ARE IN NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THE YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
OLD TRAFFORD AND THE SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
55 Flat 2 Withington Road,
Moss Side
MANCHESTER
M16 7EX
- Phone:
- 07398750150
- Email:
- hswarray11@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window