ABIGAIL PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ABIGAIL PROJECT PROVIDES ASSISTANCE AS DEEM FIT FOR ADOLESCENTS, AGES OF 11- 19YRS WHO ARE 'ORPHANED"& UNDERPRIVILEGED; PROVIDING SHELTER, FOOD, CLOTHING AND EDUCATION IN SKILLS THAT ENABLE THE ORPHANS TO HELP THEMSELVES AND THEIR ENVIRONMENT. AREA OF FOCUS IS AFICAN COUNTRIES OF NIGERIA AND MALAWI WHERE THERE ARE ASSETTS AND VOLUNTEERS. PROJECT AIMS ALSO TO BUILD A CENTRE FOR THESE DEVELOPMENTS
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2017
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Northamptonshire
- Throughout London
- Nigeria
Governance
- 17 May 2004: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALEXANDRA SHOTADE | Chair |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.40k | £0 | £2.00k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £3.00k | £2.00k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 193 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 193 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 559 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 559 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 924 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 924 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1289 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1289 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1654 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1654 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 25 NOVEMBER 2003 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 15 APRIL 2004
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY SICKNESS AND DISTRESS AMONG YOUNG PEOPLE UNDER THE AGE OF 25 WHO ARE ORPHANS BY PROVISION OF SUCH CHARITABLE ASSISTANCE AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF FOOD, CLOTHING, FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE AND THE PROVISION OF TRAINING TO IMPROVE THEIR EMPLOYMENT PROSPECT TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE UNDER THE AGE OF 25 WHO ARE ORPHANED AND RESIDENT IN THE AFRICAN COUNTRIES (NIGERIA, MALAWI) WHO ARE IN NEED BY REASON OF THEIR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES, THROUGH LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES, SO TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES THAT THEY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUAL MEMBERS OF SOCIETY.
Area of benefit
NIGERIA, MALAWI
Contact information
- Address:
-
18 LARK CLOSE
CORBY
NN18 8RS
- Phone:
- 07985256164
- Email:
- alexandra.shotade@sky.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window