FARM ANIMAL WELFARE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supporting the improvement of animal welfare, through projects of research into poultry breeding, calf health and on-farm slaughter of poultry, and public education. We are providing funds for post-graduate study and training in animal welfare.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 18 January 2005: Standard registration
- 14 December 2016: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- FAWT (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.00k | £16 | £15 | £10 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.63k | £3.89k | £14.95k | £3.05k | £12.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 12 December 2016 | 42 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | 10 September 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | 15 May 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2012 | 09 August 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2012 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 18 SEPTEMBER 2003 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 16 DECEMBER 2004.
Charitable objects
(I) TO PROMOTE THE IMPROVEMENT OF AGRICULTURE, FOOD PRODUCTION, AND THE BREEDING OF LIVESTOCK, AND TO CONDUCT RESEARCH AND TO DISSEMINATE KNOWLEDGE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO ENCOURAGE SKILL, INDUSTRY AND ANIMAL WELFARE IN ANIMAL PRODUCTION, IN PARTICULAR, BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING, BY THE FUNDING OF, OR UNDERTAKING OF RESEARCH. (II) TO PROMOTE THE IMPROVEMENT OF LIVESTOCK AND POULTRY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC. (III) TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE DEVELOPMENT AND UTILIZATION OF ANIMAL PRODUCTION SYSTEMS INTENDED TO PROMOTE ANIMAL WELFARE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window