Friends of St John's & St Clement's

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fundraises for school to pay for trips, books etc
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 04 October 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Southwark
Governance
- 19 February 2004: Standard registration
- ST JOHNS AND ST CLEMENTS PTFA (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jessica Kissack | Trustee | 04 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Louise Amy Nicholls | Trustee | 04 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Louisa O'Riordan | Trustee | 04 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emma Peacock | Trustee | 04 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Siobhan Clare Astbury | Trustee | 04 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Bannister | Trustee | 04 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Burdett | Trustee | 04 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alexis Scott | Trustee | 22 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Rayment | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 04/10/2019 | 04/10/2020 | 04/10/2021 | 04/10/2022 | 04/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.94k | £6.92k | £6.44k | £14.04k | £16.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.84k | £2.12k | £8.32k | £8.17k | £21.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 04 October 2023 | 23 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 04 October 2022 | 26 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 04 October 2021 | 01 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 04 October 2020 | 27 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 04 October 2019 | 23 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 October 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 7 MAY 2003 as amended on 01 Nov 2022 as amended on 24 Apr 2023
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL OR TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY 1. DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN STAFF PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; 2. ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED BUT IN PRACTICE SOUTHWARK, GREATER LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Adys Road
Peckham
London
SE15 4DY
- Phone:
- 020 7525 9210
- Email:
- sjscptfa@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window