THE ETHICAL PROPERTY FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We support charitable organisations and community groups to manage their premises effectively, whether rented or owned, through expert property advice, education, consultancy and research.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 29 January 2004: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Luke Thurlow | Trustee | 12 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Paul Hague | Trustee | 21 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Abomeli | Trustee | 22 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Anne Mary Nicholson | Trustee | 26 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
KIM WORTS | Trustee | 28 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL FAHY | Trustee | 24 July 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £177.20k | £194.86k | £196.78k | £284.53k | £233.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £174.43k | £191.72k | £184.96k | £277.81k | £225.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £4.50k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 10 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 10 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 18 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 18 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 07 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 07 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 23 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 23 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 01 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 01 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 07/05/2003 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 06/11/2013
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE SUCH PURPOSES AS MAY BE CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND IN PARTICULAR TO PROMOTE THE EFFICIENCY AND EFFICACY OF CHARITIES
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ethical Property Foundation
70 Cowcross Street
LONDON
EC1M 6EJ
- Phone:
- 01923378603
- Email:
- mail@ethicalproperty.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window