SRI GURU GOBIND SINGH JI SANGAT BHATRA EDUCATIONAL AND CULTURAL CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To relieve poverty and sickness and distress. To advance education and training. To preserve and protect good health. To provide and assist in the provision of facilities for the recreation and other leisure time occupation of the said inhabitants in the interests of social welfare with the object of improving their condition of life.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cheshire East
- Lancashire
- Manchester City
- Trafford
Governance
- 03 June 2004: Standard registration
No other names
- Estyn: Her Majesty's Inspectorate For Education And Training In Wales
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Utam Singh | Trustee | 18 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Charan Kawal Singh | Trustee | 18 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jasjeevan Singh Bhaker | Trustee | 18 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rajesh Armaan Singh Sathi | Trustee | 18 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sawinder Singh | Trustee | 18 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nirpal Singh | Trustee | 17 May 2009 |
|
|
||||
Kimat Singh | Trustee | 17 May 2009 |
|
|
||||
Shamsher Singh | Trustee | 17 May 2009 |
|
|
||||
Rashpal Singh | Trustee | 17 May 2009 |
|
|
||||
Karnail Singh | Trustee | 17 May 2009 |
|
|
||||
Parkash Singh | Trustee | 17 May 2009 |
|
|||||
HARBHAJAN SINGH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BALBER KOMAL SINGH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £448.76k | £239.91k | £96.78k | £190.91k | £227.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £105.56k | £133.82k | £43.37k | £109.04k | £141.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 90 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 90 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 May 2024 | 113 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 23 May 2024 | 113 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 April 2023 | 64 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 05 April 2023 | 64 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 August 2022 | 203 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 22 August 2022 | 203 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 August 2021 | 192 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 11 August 2021 | 192 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23 NOVEMBER 2003 AS AMENDED 9 MAY 2004
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF MANCHESTER AND SURROUNDING BOROUGHS AND IN PARTICULAR FOR THE FOLLOWING PURPOSES: 1 TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND SICKNESS AND DISTRESS 2 TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TRAINING 3 TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT GOOD HEALTH 4 TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF THE SAID INHABITANTS IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE
Area of benefit
MANCHESTER AND SURROUNDING BOROUGHS
Contact information
- Address:
-
57 UPPER CHORLTON ROAD
MANCHESTER
M16 7RW
- Phone:
- 07890087552
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window