THE GLOUCESTERSHIRE GUILD OF CRAFTSMEN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Through membership of the Guild we promote high standards of making and design in a wide range of fine crafts. We also advance public education and awareness in crafts and craftsmanship. This is achieved through exhibitions, workshops demonstrations organised through our new gallery 18 Rotunda Terrace, Montpellier Street, Cheltenham, which opened 2022. More information on our website.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
74 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 20 April 2005: Standard registration
- Gloucestershire Guild (Working name)
- GLOUCESTERSHIRE GUILD OF CRAFTSMEN (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Valentine Charles Wiggins | Chair | 12 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Simon Pocock-Cluley Mr | Trustee | 18 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Clarke | Trustee | 30 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Lippiatt | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Louise Susan Pocock - Cluley | Trustee | 04 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Eric Leslie Stamper | Trustee | 04 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Ella James | Trustee | 06 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Elizabeth Beadsmoore | Trustee | 13 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Harriet St Leger | Trustee | 04 April 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.43k | £7.78k | £6.99k | £9.07k | £47.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.11k | £11.07k | £9.80k | £8.29k | £56.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 16 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 November 2020 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21 MARCH 2003 AS AMENDED 7 APRIL 2005. as amended on 04 Apr 2018
Charitable objects
1) TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE WHICH WILL ENCOURAGE THE EXERCISE AND MAINTAIN THE STANDARDS OF CRAFTS BOTH ANCIENT AND MODERN, PRESERVE AND IMPROVE CRAFTSMANSHIP; AND 2) TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION AND AWARENESS IN CRAFTS AND CRAFTSMANSHIP.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED, IN PRACTICE GLOUCESTERSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
18 Rotunda Terrace
Montpellier Street
Cheltenham
GL50 1SW
- Phone:
- 07562516545
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window