Trustees THE GLOUCESTERSHIRE GUILD OF CRAFTSMEN
Charity Number: 1109160

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Valentine Charles Wiggins | Chair | 12 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Simon Pocock-Cluley Mr | Trustee | 18 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Clarke | Trustee | 30 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Lippiatt | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Louise Susan Pocock - Cluley | Trustee | 04 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Eric Leslie Stamper | Trustee | 04 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Ella James | Trustee | 06 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Elizabeth Beadsmoore | Trustee | 13 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Harriet St Leger | Trustee | 04 April 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.