Trustees THE STUART LOW TRUST

Charity number: 1102325
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Timothy James Davis Trustee 26 March 2025
None on record
Brian Watson Trustee 25 September 2024
None on record
Christos Roumeliotis Trustee 25 September 2024
None on record
Jacqueline Noone Trustee 29 May 2024
None on record
Martin Haines Trustee 01 February 2024
None on record
Olga Sviatochevski Trustee 27 September 2023
None on record
Katherine Stokes Trustee 26 July 2023
None on record
Dr Eliat Aram Trustee 22 March 2023
None on record
Rebecca Newman Trustee 23 November 2022
None on record
Anthony James Wright Trustee 23 September 2020
None on record
June - Anne Murray Trustee 01 November 2017
None on record