EASTON GYMNASTICS CLUB
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO ADVANCE THE PHYSICAL EDUCATION AND DEVELOPMENT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE PROVISION OF INSTRUCTION AND FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND RECREATION, PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY FOR GYMNASTICS, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Norfolk
Governance
- 15 July 2004: Standard registration
- 23 January 2017: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 23 January 2017: Funds transferred to 1161894 EASTON GYMNASTICS CLUB
- EASTON GYM CLUB (Working name)
- EGC (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2011 | 30/09/2012 | 30/09/2013 | 30/09/2014 | 30/09/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £54.09k | £46.16k | £58.27k | £68.19k | £260.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £41.98k | £37.79k | £39.43k | £53.20k | £60.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2015 | 16 December 2016 | 139 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
30 September 2015
(These accounts |
16 December 2016 | 139 days late | |
Annual return | 30 September 2014 | 15 March 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2014 | 15 March 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 September 2013 | 09 February 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2013 | 10 February 2014 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01/09/1984 AS AMENDED ON 13/06/2003 AS AMENDED ON 01/10/2003 AS AMENDED ON 26/04/2004 AS AMENDED ON 19/10/2009 AS AMENDED ON 07/03/2012
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE PHYSICAL EDUCATION AND DEVELOPMENT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE PROVISION OF INSTRUCTION AND FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND RECREATION, PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY FOR GYMNASTICS, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE NORFOLK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window