HINDU FORUM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Assist running of a youth club, by providing advice and guidance to youth worker. Assist women's group with administrative support. Assist elderly persons' club, explaining benefits and health advice. Raising awareness of Hinduism. . An Umbrella organisation for all Hindu Clubs, Voluntary Organisations & Societies. Raise concerns, regarding any proposed legislation which affects Hindus adversely
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Birmingham City
- Dudley
- Sandwell
- Walsall
- Wolverhampton
Governance
- 28 January 2004: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ashvin Kumar Patel | Chair | 18 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
AMRATLAL JIVANBHAI MISTRY | Trustee | 17 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
BALBIR SEIMAR | Trustee | 17 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
SANJAY PATEL | Trustee | 18 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Vasant Khandubhai Mistry | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.50k | £12.79k | £1.49k | £25.00k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.83k | £9.95k | £7.84k | £908 | £160 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £15.00k | £6.22k | N/A | £25.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 February 2025 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 February 2023 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 February 2021 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION DATED 19 JUNE 2001
Charitable objects
I) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND SICKNESS AMONG THE INHABITANTS (OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT) INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO THOSE OF THE HINDU FAITH, WHO ARE DEPRIVED AND WHO LACK THE PHYSICAL AND/OR FINANCIAL RESOURCES THEREBY ENABLING SUCH PEOPLE TO HAVE AN INCREASED ABILITY TO OBTAIN EMPLOYMENT AND TO BE ABLE TO PLAY A PART IN THE SOCIETY IN WHICH THEY LIVE. II) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF SUCH INHABITANTS WITHOUT THE DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BT ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. III) TO ESTABLISH A COMMUNITY CENTRE (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE HINDU FORUM") AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME, WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY OR OTHER PERSON OR BODY IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS...
Area of benefit
WALSALL
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O Shree Ram Mandir (Walsall)
Ford Street
WALSALL
WS2 9BW
- Phone:
- 07973198032
- Email:
- Info@hfwalsall.org.uk
- Website:
-
HTTPS://WWW.HFWALSALL.ORG.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window