Financial history REAL LIVES REAL CHOICES

Charity number: 1104782
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2010 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/07/2014
Total gross income £219.65k £96.55k £132.90k £111.94k £139.75k
Total expenditure £153.91k £105.38k £127.14k £116.07k £162.78k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A