SUDANESE CHILDREN IN NEED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We aim to promote any charitable purpose for the benefit of Sudanese people particularly children and their parents.by; * advancing their education and training. * releiving those who are in need by reason of their poverty, sickness and promote good health. * the provision of facilities for recreation or other leisure time occupation in the intrest of social welfare .
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 06 April 2004: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KHADIGA KHOGALI | Chair |
|
|
|||||
MOHAMED ELMOGTABA | Trustee | 17 March 2011 |
|
|
||||
AYA ELZEIN | Trustee | 17 March 2011 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMED SIDKI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MOHAMED ABDERHMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
OMER ELHASSAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MAGDA ABDEL RAHMAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 May 2024 | 110 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION DATED 22 SEPTEMBER 2003.
Charitable objects
3.1. TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS OF SUDANESE ORIGIN, PARTICULARLY CHILDREN AND THEIR PARENTS BY: 3.2.1. ADVANCING THEIR EDUCATION AND TRAINING; 3.2.2. RELIEVING THOSE WHO ARE IN NEED BY REASON OF THEIR POVERTY, SICKNESS AND PROMOTE GOOD HEALTH; 3.2.3. THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE PERSONS OF SUDANESE ORIGIN.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
35 BAYHAM STREET
LONDON
NW1 0AA
- Phone:
- 02073879941
- Email:
- kkhogali@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window