HERTFORDSHIRE EDUCATIONAL RESOURCES TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the charity are to provide, maintain and advance the education of the public and in particular but not so as to limit the generality of the foregoing: 1. to support schools in the county of Hertfordshire in achieving specialist schools status 2. to support the development of specialist schools 3. to support maintaine dschools at levels iin the county of Hertfordshire
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 17 March 2004: Standard registration
- 12 December 2012: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £463 | £188 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.33k | £10.45k | £15.45k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 05 December 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 03 January 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 14 February 2011 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 26 May 2010 | 115 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 12 JANUARY 2004
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE MAINTAIN AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT SO AS TO LIMIT THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING: I. TO SUPPORT SCHOOLS IN THE COUNTY OF HERTFORD IN ACHIEVING THE STATUS OF SPECIALIST SCHOOLS AND OPERATING AS SUCH II. TO SUPPORT THE DEVELOPMENT OF SPECIALIST SCHOOLS BY PROVIDING WIDESPREAD INTEREST IN AND TO INFORM THE GENERAL PUBLIC ABOUT THE SPECIALIST SCHOOLS PROGRAMME III. TO SUPPORT MAINTAINED SCHOOLS AT ALL LEVELS IN THE COUNTY OF HERTFORD GENERALLY IN PROJECTS AND SERVICES NOT MET BY STATUTORY FUNDING.
Area of benefit
HERTFORDSHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window