CHELSEA SYNAGOGUE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advancement of Jewish Faith
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £1,940 from 4 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Kensington And Chelsea
Governance
- 02 February 2004: Standard registration
- THE CHELSEA SYNAGOGUE TRUST (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Daniele Cogoi | Trustee | 07 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Delphine Long | Trustee | 07 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Itzhak Rashkovsky | Trustee | 07 June 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £85.90k | £69.74k | £66.03k | £90.35k | £77.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £69.65k | £62.03k | £64.13k | £87.08k | £74.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.94k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 November 2024 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 04 November 2024 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 18 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 15 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 02 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 02 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 10 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 10 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 16 JANUARY 2004
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY SHALL BE THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE JEWISH FAITH, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF GRANTS TO THE CHELSEA SYNAGOGUE AND SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
CHELSEA SYNAGOGUE
SMITH TERRACE
LONDON
SW3 4DL
- Phone:
- 02073516292
- Email:
- golda@chelseasynagogue.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window