THE FRIENDS OF ST PETERS SCHOOL ASSOCIATION, BILLERICAY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ORGANISING FUND RAISING ACTIVITIES, PROFITS OF WHICH ARE DIRECTED ENTIRELY TO ENHANCING THE EDUCATION OF THE CHILDREN OF ST PETER'S SCHOOL.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
96 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Essex
Governance
- 09 February 2004: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Emma Dawson | Chair | 08 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dorota Wasilczuk | Trustee | 10 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Katie Da Costa | Trustee | 10 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Amy Estrada | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Helen Nicholson | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Claire Frances Connolly | Trustee | 21 October 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.81k | £17.60k | £29.34k | £30.66k | £41.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.59k | £11.61k | £28.00k | £63.45k | £38.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 08 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 08 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 01 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 01 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 15 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 15 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 06 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 09 November 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 09 November 2019 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23 SEPTEMBER 2003
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY: (1) DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; (2) ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS
Area of benefit
THE CATCHMENT AREA OF ST PETER'S CATHOLIC PRIMARY SCHOOL, BILLERICAY
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Mountnessing Road
BILLERICAY
Essex
CM12 9EU
- Phone:
- 07788 728859
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window