Financial history BILLINGSHURST COMMUNITY TRANSPORT LIMITED

Charity number: 1101884
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £33.72k £24.32k £143.64k £21.06k £23.61k
Total expenditure £39.95k £27.34k £30.80k £34.09k £36.15k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £2.00k £2.78k £574 N/A N/A