EUROPEAN SQUIRREL INITIATIVE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the survival of the red squirrel and the preservation of trees and woodlands in the UK and throughout Europe through control of the grey squirrel and invasive alien species.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 16 September 2004: Standard registration
- ESI (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Graham Taylor | Chair | 01 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
William John Wilding | Trustee | 01 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Falcon | Trustee | 25 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
GEORGE NELSON FARR | Trustee | 10 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
John Charles Falcon Dutton | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.07k | £39.95k | £39.95k | £40.06k | £31.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.42k | £28.98k | £28.98k | £41.28k | £28.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 March 2024 | 51 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 22 March 2024 | 51 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2022 | 360 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2022 | 360 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 15 DECEMBER 2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 17 AUGUST 2004 AND 5 JUNE 2008.
Charitable objects
1. TO CONSERVE PRESERVE AND RESTORE THE NATIVE RED SQUIRREL SPECIES AND WOODLAND HABITATS; 2. TO ADVANCE AND PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE CONSERVATION AND PRESERVATION AND RESTORATION OF THE RED SQUIRREL SPECIES; 3. TO CARRY OUT AND PROMOTE RESEARCH TO ASSIST WITH 1. AND 2. ABOVE INCLUDING RESEARCH IN HUMANE METHODS OF CONTROL OF THE ALIEN GREY SQUIRREL SPECIES; AND 4. TO CONSERVE PRESERVE AND RESTORE WOODLANDS WHETHER OR NOT IN CONJUNCTION WITH OTHER PARTIES FROM TIME TO TIME, AND MAINLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, WITHIN EUROPE.
Area of benefit
EUROPE
Contact information
- Address:
-
HENSTEAD OLD RECTORY
HULVER ROAD
HENSTEAD
BECCLES
NR34 7LA
- Phone:
- 01502475110
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window