WATLINGTON PRIMARY SCHOOL PTA

Charity Number: 1102185
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity supports the work of Watlington Primary School and advances the education of its pupils by: organising fundraising events; making grants towards school equipment or activities; organising or supporting school events and activities.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Total income: £17,318
Total expenditure: £12,423

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Oxfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 19 February 2004: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Marc Kjaer-Nielsen Chair 28 June 2024
None on record
Justine Carter Trustee 15 July 2021
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £25.00k £7.52k £18.67k £18.05k £17.32k
Total expenditure £35.09k £6.43k £19.51k £21.09k £12.42k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 14 May 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 21 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 08 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 10 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 02 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
LOVE LANE
WATLINGTON
OXON
OX49 5RB
Phone:
01491612474