BAWTRY ACTION FOR RECREATION AND SPORT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
RAISE FUNDS FOR IMPROVEMENT OF LOCAL SPORTS AND RECREATION. ORGANISE ANNUAL BAWTRY SPORTS DAY.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Doncaster
Governance
- 25 February 2004: Standard registration
- BARS (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ian Cotterhill | Trustee | 09 February 2024 |
|
|||||
ALEXANDER YOUNG | Trustee | 01 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
CHARLES PETER BURTON | Trustee | 10 January 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £77.25k | £48.97k | £64.03k | £92.08k | £81.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £97.00k | £59.97k | £57.34k | £98.18k | £104.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.60k | £19.29k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 28 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 28 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 29 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 29 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 29 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 29 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 29 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 29 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2019 | 30 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2019 | 30 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 2ND DECEMBER 2003.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF BAWTRY AND THE SURROUNDING AREA WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY I PROVISION AND ASSISTANCE OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE, SPORT AND RECREATION. II ASSOCIATING WITH LOCAL RESIDENTS, LOCAL AUTHORITIES AND OTHER VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO IMPROVE THE ENVIRONMENT AND CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
BAWTRY AND THE SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
11 SCHOOL WALK
BAWTRY
DONCASTER
DN10 6HP
- Phone:
- 07971211393
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window