FERNDOWN AND WEST MOORS GATEWAY CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Social and recreational activities for people with learning disabilities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Dorset
Governance
- 13 April 2004: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KEITH HENDERSON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Glenis Schollar | Trustee | 31 January 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.30k | £85 | £1 | £80 | £13 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.96k | £300 | £40 | £1.37k | £5.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 26 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 26 February 2025 | 241 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 23 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 17 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 08 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12 SEPTEMBER 2002
Charitable objects
A) THE RELIEF OF PEOPLE WITH A LEARNING DISABILITY IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF HELP AND SUPPORT FOR THEM AND FOR THEIR FAMILIES, DEPENDANTS AND CARERS, AND TO PREVENT LEARNING DISABILITIES FOR THE PUBLIC B) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR PEOPLE WHO HAVE NEED THEREOF BY REASON OF LEARNING DISABILITY WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
FERNDOWN / WESTMOORS, DORSET
Contact information
- Address:
-
18 WEBBS CLOSE
ASHLEY HEATH
RINGWOOD
BH24 2EP
- Phone:
- 01425476568
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window