Accounts and annual returns LISKEARD AND AREA MONDAY CLUB

Charity number: 1104936
Charity reporting is overdue by 1566 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 105 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 105 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 471 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 471 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 836 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 836 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1201 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1201 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1566 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1566 days