COUNCIL FOR VOLUNTARY SERVICE NORTH WEST KENT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ADVANCING LOCAL COMMUNITY ACTION IN DARTFORD, GRAVESHAM AND SWANLEY. CVSNWK EXISTS TO PROVIDE SUPPORT AND INFRASTRUCTURE SERVICES AND A REPRESENTATIVE VOICE TO THE THIRD SECTOR WITHIN NORTH WEST KENT BRINGING GROUPS TOGETHER AND PROMOTING COMMUNITY COHESION.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £62,423 from 2 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
9 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Kent
Governance
- 18 February 2004: Standard registration
- NORTH WEST KENT COUNCIL FOR VOLUNTARY SERVICE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANDREW UPSTILL | Chair | 19 February 2006 |
|
|||||
Peter Brian Scollard | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Catherine Maybourne | Trustee | 08 February 2023 |
|
|||||
Genevieve Jones | Trustee | 08 February 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £210.22k | £191.58k | £189.60k | £139.72k | £123.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £212.17k | £198.85k | £165.60k | £162.08k | £153.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £47.53k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.00k | £149.70k | N/A | £126.15k | £62.42k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 22 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 13 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 February 2021 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 10 February 2021 | 10 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 20 JANUARY 2004 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 6 AUGUST 2009.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, OR ASSIST THE PROVISION OF, AND THE DEVELOPMENT OF FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, INCLUDING SOCIAL ACTIVITIES, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE LOCAL COMMUNITY; A. TO PROVIDE, OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF, AND THE DEVELOPMENT OF FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, INCLUDING SOCIAL ACTIVITIES, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE LOCAL COMMUNITY; B. TO PROVIDE FOR THE PROTECTION OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, DISTRESS AND SICKNESS; C. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND LEARNING. D. TO PROMOTE AND ORGANISE CO-OPERATION IN THE ACHIEVEMENT OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS AND TO THAT END TO BRING TOGETHER, THROUGH PARTNERSHIP WORKING, STATUTORY AND PRIVATE SECTOR ORGANISATIONS ENGAGED IN THE FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS. E. TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF THE MEMBERS OF THE DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITY OF THE DARTFORD, GRAVESHAM & SWANLEY AREA IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY, AND HELP MEET THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY
Area of benefit
NORTH WEST KENT
Contact information
- Address:
-
NORTHFLEET VETERANS CLUB
THE HILL
NORTHFLEET
DA11 9EU
- Phone:
- 01474 354479
- Email:
- sarah@cvsnwk.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window