Accounts and annual returns ANGLO DUTCH BOND
Charity number: 1105009
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 03 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2019 | 03 September 2020 | 126 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2018 | 26 August 2019 | 118 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2017 | 14 June 2018 | 45 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2017 | Not Required |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window