INTERNATIONAL SEMINAR ON RELIGIOUS EDUCATION AND VALUES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
EDUCATIONAL RESEARCH
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Australia
- Austria
- Canada
- China
- Denmark
- Estonia
- Finland
- Germany
- Greece
- India
- Indonesia
- Ireland
- Israel
- Japan
- Kenya
- Latvia
- Namibia
- Netherlands
- New Zealand
- Nigeria
- Northern Ireland
- Norway
- Romania
- Russia
- Scotland
- South Africa
- Sweden
- Switzerland
- Turkey
- Uganda
- United States
Governance
- 18 March 2004: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PROFESSOR JULIAN STERN | Chair |
|
|
|||||||
Professor Stephen McKinney | Trustee | 13 September 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Dr ELIZABETH ARWECK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
REVD CANON PROFESSOR LESLIE JOHN FRANCIS | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.13k | £247 | £201 | £3 | £3.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.30k | £278 | £0 | £479 | £202 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 08 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12 JANUARY 2004 AS AMENDED 1 AUGUST 2008
Charitable objects
1. TO PROMOTE HIGH QUALITY RESEARCH INTO RELIGIOUS EDUCATION WHETHER IN PUBLIC OR PRIVATE EDUCATION SYSTEMS OR WITHIN AND BETWEEN RELIGIOUS COMMUNITIES AND 2. TO ENCOURAGE YOUNGER AND/OR EMERGING RELIGIOUS EDUCATORS TO UNDERTAKE SUCH RESEARCH, AND; 3. TO DISSEMINATE THE RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH BY MEANS OF MEETING OF THE SEMINAR, THROUGH CONTACTS AND EXCHANGE BETWEEN MEMBERS AND BY PUBLICATION SO AS 4. TO INFLUENCE THE DEVELOPMENT OF RELIGIOUS EDUCATION IN PUBLIC OR PRIVATE EDUCATION SYSTEMS AND IN RELIGIOUS COMMUNITIES.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Bishop Grosseteste University
Longdales Road
LINCOLN
LN1 3DY
- Phone:
- 07422 688964
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window