PASTOR TRAINING INTERNATIONAL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH THROUGHOUT THE WORLD PRINCIPALLY THROUGH THE TEACHING OF, PROVISION OF TRAINING TO AND SUPPORT OF CHRISTIAN PASTORS TOGETHER WITH THE PUBLICATION AND DISTRIBUTION OF CHRISTIAN LITERATURE.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cuba
- Ethiopia
- Ghana
- India
- Ivory Coast
- Kenya
- Mozambique
- Nepal
- Pakistan
- Tanzania
- Thailand
- Uganda
- Ukraine
- Zambia
Governance
- 10 February 2004: Standard registration
- 18 December 2023: Removed (Removed by application)
- 18 December 2023: Funds transferred to 1127503 Equipping Pastors Worldwide Ltd
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £151.74k | £214.10k | £117.87k | £120.33k | £185.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £142.06k | £162.62k | £93.09k | £79.10k | £133.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 18 July 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 28 May 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 26 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 26 June 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION CONVERSION DATED 15 NOV 2019 as amended on 05 Mar 2020
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH THROUGHOUT THE WORLD IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE ARTICLES OF FAITH SET OUT AT ARTICLE 35 OF THE ARTICLES PRINCIPALLY (BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION) THROUGH THE TEACHING OF, PROVISION OF TRAINING TO AND SUPPORT OF CHRISTIAN PASTORS TOGETHER WITH THE PUBLICATION AND DISTRIBUTION OF CHRISTIAN LITERATURE.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window