FRIENDS OF NADEZHDA JOB CENTRE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objective of the Friends of Nadezhda Job Centre is to provide relief of poverty by supporting the charitable works of the Nadezhda Job Centre, Cape Town, South Africa.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2008
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Other Finance
- Throughout England And Wales
- South Africa
Governance
- 12 July 2004: Standard registration
- 13 August 2009: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2005 | 31/10/2006 | 31/10/2007 | 31/10/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.92k | £13.25k | £5.55k | £1.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.94k | £8.20k | £9.78k | £10.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2008 | 17 July 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2008 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2007 | 21 August 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2006 | 24 August 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2006 | 24 August 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 October 2005 | 17 July 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2005 | 14 September 2006 | 14 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 13 JANUARY 2004 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 25 JUNE 2004
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY BY SUPPORTING THE CHARITABLE WORKS OF THE NADEZHDA JOB CENTRE, CAPETOWN, SOUTH AFRICA
Area of benefit
CAPETOWN, SOUTH AFRICA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window